THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 19:44:10 PM
Sharma, Kawal Jeet
CPSO#:
42626
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Mahatma Gandhi Memorial Medical College, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact Records Management Ltd, 1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13, Toronto, ON., M9L 0A3, Telephone: 1-800-775-0093.
Date Received: 10 Sep 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:17 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 18 Feb 1980 to 31 Mar 1980
Other - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Research Fellows - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 1968 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jul 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2020 |