THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 6:31:39 AM
Jones, Barbara Ann
CPSO#:
42538
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 May 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Barbara A. Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 2 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Rd, Ottawa, ON K1H 8L1
Royal Ottawa Hospital - Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Ave, Ottawa, ON K1Z 7K4
Date Received: 13 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 May 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2022 |