THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:49:31 PM
Lee, Young Min
CPSO#:
42513
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Aug 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Apr 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10815 Bathurst St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9Y2
Phone: 905-780-1050
Fax: 905-780-2640
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YOUNG MIN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 1983 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 21 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 2006 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Apr 2005
Summary:
On April 25, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Young Min Lee to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to hugs of a patient within a psychotherapeutic relationship.
On September 21, 2005, the Discipline Committee ordered the following:
1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Lee(s certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months from the date of this order (September 21, 2005), the entire period of which shall be suspended.
2. The following term, condition and limitation be imposed on Dr. Lee(s certificate of registration:
(a) Dr. Lee must successfully complete the College(s course on boundary issues at his own expense within a period of six (6) months of the order and that proof of successful completion be provided to the Registrar forthwith.
3. Dr. Lee is required to attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
4. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Note regarding paragraph 2 (a) above: On April 7, 2006, Dr. Lee successfully completed the College(s course on boundary issues.
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 2005-10-31
Hearing Date(s): Jan 31, 2005