THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:40:18 AM
Bali, Neena
CPSO#:
42500
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Sep 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Oct 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Daya, Neena (used until: 14 Jan 2001 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dar Es Salaam, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6615
Fax: (613) 798-2988
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:08 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEENA BALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 1992 |