THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:35:23 PM
Sogbein, Solomon Kolawole
CPSO#:
42490
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Aug 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Group
2948 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON K2H 8T5
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S. Kolawole Sogbein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Past patients should contact the North Bay Regional Health Centre and speak with the switchboard operator who will facilitate the request: 705-474-8600 ext 4748600.
Date Received: 26 Nov 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:18 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SOLOMON KOLAWOLE SOGBEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOGBEIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 1983 |