THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:55:36 AM
Srinivasan, Vasundhara
CPSO#:
42486
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
28 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Oct 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Kannada, Telugu
Education: Mysore University, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Vasu Srinivasan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 5 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:08 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Jul 2023 |