THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:57:50 PM
Dancel, Mary Lou Mamuri
CPSO#:
42475
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Feb 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tagalog
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1600 Firwood Cres
Peterborough ON K9K 1S8
Date Received: 05 Feb 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:08 Jun 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 1983 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 25 Nov 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 27 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Feb 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: September 28, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mary Lou Mamuri Dancel to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 28, 2015:
Dr. Dancel was the subject of College investigations into allegations that she fell below the standard of care in her record-keeping, treatment and care in her psychiatric practice. As a result of the investigations:
- Dr. Dancel will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.
- Dr. Dancel will engage in professional education pertaining to her care and treatment of patients, including in her prescribing and record-keeping.
- Dr. Dancel's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the completion of all aspects of the education program.