THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:40:55 PM
Steiner, Meir
CPSO#:
42447
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Dec 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Hebrew
Education: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv Uni, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Meir Steiner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 19 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Aug 2018 |