THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 20:12:42 PM
Butany, Vidya Jagdish
CPSO#:
42439
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Punjab University India, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seen by Dr. Butany on or before December 18, 2019 may submit a medical record request to:
Records Management Ltd
[email protected]
1 High Meadow Place
Unit 13
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
1-800-775-0093.
Date Received: 20 Dec 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:09 Jun 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 May 2023 |