THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 3:39:36 AM
Roberts, Jeremy Keith Alken
CPSO#:
42435
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
03 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Sheffield University School of Medicine, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:10 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 1983 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 21 Oct 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 1993 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 26 Oct 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2008 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 03 Sep 2009 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 03 Nov 2010 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Nov 2010
Summary:
On November 3, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Roberts has committed an act of professional misconduct under clause 51(1)(b) of the Code, in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has found that Dr. Roberts committed an act of professional misconduct that would be an act of professional misconduct as defined in Ontario Regulation 856/93.
On or about March 13, 2008, Dr. Robert was found guilty by the Council of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Alberta of unbecoming conduct and/or demonstrating a lack of skill or judgment in that he:
(a) Had an inappropriate relationship, which included sexual activity, with his patient.
(b) Inappropriately used prescription medication without the prescription of another physician.
(c) Failed to create and maintain a clinical record for Patient "A" on five dates.
(d) Failed to make arrangements from the transfer of care of Patient "A" to another psychiatrist.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. The Registrar revoke Dr. Roberts' certificate of registration immediately.
2. Dr. Roberts appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. Dr. Roberts pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650, within sixty (60) days.
4. The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 3, 2010
Application for Reinstatement
Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
Decision Date: 22 Jan 2018
Decision: Application Denied