THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:10:15 AM
Chandrasena, Ranjith Dayananda
CPSO#:
42434
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Aug 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhalese
Education: University of Ceylon, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
214-240 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1C1
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham Public General Hospital Society |
Chatham |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Four Counties Health Services |
Newbury |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RANJITH DAYANANDA CHANDRASENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDRASENA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2020 |