THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 2:25:43 AM
Butany, Jagdish Washo
CPSO#:
42406
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Aug 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Sindhi
Education: Mysore University, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centeer
Dept of Pathology, D-Wing
D Wing
2075 Bayview Ave,
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164804009
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:21 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAGDISH WASHO BUTANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTANY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 1990 |