THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:03:25 AM
Mesaros, Jelena
CPSO#:
42398
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English, Serbian, Yugoslav
Education: University of Belgrade, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Psychiatry Department
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6208
Fax: (416) 469-6805
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:09 Jun 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JELENA MESAROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MESAROS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1990 |