THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 5:33:52 AM
Oyewumi, Lamidi Kolawole
CPSO#:
42390
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Aug 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Aug 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7011
Fax: (905) 472-7371
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAMIDI KOLAWOLE OYEWUMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OYEWUMI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 1988 |