THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:38:09 AM
Szentgyorgyi, Eva Maria
CPSO#:
42381
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Apr 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University of Semmelweis, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LifeLabs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON M9W 6J6
Phone: (416) 675-4530
Fax: 416 213-4206
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:22 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EVA MARIA SZENTGYORGYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZENTGYORGYI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 1990 |