THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:24:00 AM
Barrenechea, Ana Maria
CPSO#:
42378
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Feb 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Chile, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Date Received: 24 Jul 2017
Instructions/Address:Until October 2017, patients may submit written requests for medical records to her previous practice address:
Suite 609
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON M4X 1W4
Date Received: 24 Mar 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jul 2017 |