THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:20:07 PM
Stavrakaki, Chrissoula
CPSO#:
42355
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
06 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Nov 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Stavrakaki-Mintsioulis, Chrissoula (used until: 09 Mar 2006 )
Stavrakaki, Chrissoula Stylianides (used until: 10 Dec 1997 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Chrissoula Stavrakaki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Sep 2021 |