THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 9:18:30 AM
Logan, William Joseph
CPSO#:
42343
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 May 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Chicago, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 31 May 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Virginia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:28 Sep 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 May 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |