THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:26:43 AM
Mambo, Nobby Chipo
CPSO#:
42321
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Mar 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Birmingham, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:23 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1974 to 31 Dec 1974
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1975 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1976 to 31 Dec 1976
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Apr 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 1999 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2003 |