THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:20:11 PM
Froud, Peter John
CPSO#:
42298
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Bristol Medical School, University of Br, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Peter Froud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 6 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:17 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 1999 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 19 May 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2010 |