THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 5:28:54 AM
Sturman, Dubravka
CPSO#:
42281
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 May 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English
Education: University of Zagreb, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:31 Mar 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 1994 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2010 |