THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 14:39:18 PM
Fischbacher, Theodore
CPSO#:
42269
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Feb 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
344 Kerr St
Kerr Street Medical Centre
Oakville ON L6K 3B8
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Fischbacher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 6 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THEODORE FISCHBACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISCHBACHER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2007 |