THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:29:15 AM
Mandelman, Krystyna
CPSO#:
42253
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1972
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Nov 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M3H 3S3
Phone: (416) 398-8387
Fax: (416) 398-0285
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:13 Mar 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRYSTYNA MANDELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANDELMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 1989 |