THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 12:56:37 PM
Fong, Ignatius Wellington
CPSO#:
42243
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1976
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 May 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division Of Infectious Diseases
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5867
Fax: (416) 864-5310
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:19 Jan 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IGNATIUS WELLINGTON FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 May 1993 |