THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 20:29:25 PM
Trenholm, Ceferina Llacer
CPSO#:
42226
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tagalog
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:06 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 1990 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 30 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2013 |