THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:04:07 PM
Waterfall, William Ernest
CPSO#:
42187
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Oct 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sheffield University School of Medicine, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:05 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 1994 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jun 2007 |