THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 7:49:58 AM
Wojakowski, Krystyna Halina
CPSO#:
42186
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Oct 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Polish, Russian
Education: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Command Records Management
100 Piccadilly Street
London ON N6A 1R8
Phone: 519-672-1460
Toll Free: 1-888-335-3379
Date Received: 16 Jun 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:21 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1985 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |