THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:50:14 AM
Racine, Francois
CPSO#:
42142
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Jan 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Francois Racine
Medical Archives
160 de Serignan Street
Gatineau QC J8V 3V1
Date Received: 28 Apr 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 May 1975 |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1987 |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |