THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:49:04 PM
Mohanna, Samy Stephane Maurice
CPSO#:
41982
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Community Medicine |
Effective:27 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 1973 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 Jan 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Public Service Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |