THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 14:48:16 PM
Walker, Irwin Ronald
CPSO#:
41934
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 1973
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Oct 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medic, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital And Cancer Ctr
Room A3-65
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76384
Fax: (905) 575-7320
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:20 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IRWIN RONALD WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1973 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 1994 |