THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 6:07:25 AM
Varkey, George Plamoottil
CPSO#:
41925
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Oct 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Malayalam, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1955
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients should include their full mailing address, phone number, and the last date they attended the physicians office.
Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Suite 303
240 Wharncliffe Road North
London, Ontario
N6H 4P2
Date Received: 03 Nov 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:11 Dec 1961 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 1994 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2011 |