THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:00:29 PM
Black, Oludolapo Ope-Olu Onikepo
CPSO#:
41792
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Irish Conjoint Board, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnyside Medical Arts Centre
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Suite 203
Toronto ON M6R 3B2
Phone: (416) 533-5575
Fax: (416) 533-5575
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLUDOLAPO OPE-OLU ONIKEPO BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1972 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 May 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Mar 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jan 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1984 |