THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:26:57 PM
Moola, Cassim
CPSO#:
41774
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Apr 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Feb 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Natal, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
430 The Boardwalk
Unit 108
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Phone: 519 5768760
Fax: 519 5768768
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:25 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CASSIM MOOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOOLA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Sep 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 1988 |