THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 4:47:43 AM
Voineskos, George
CPSO#:
41629
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Feb 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Jul 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: National and Kapodistrian Univ of Athens, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Feb 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 27, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. George Voineskos to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 27, 2018:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Voineskos failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. During the course of this investigation, Dr. Voineskos retired from practice for health reasons. As a result, Dr. Voineskos has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)