THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 6:10:15 AM
Hynes, David Michael
CPSO#:
41335
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 May 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Cambridge School of Clinic, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David M Hynes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:06 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1990 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Jun 2017 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: May 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Michael Hynes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective May 23, 2016:
Dr. Hynes may not engage in and/or perform mammography and breast ultrasound.