THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:53:42 AM
Silva Ruette, Enrique Gerardo
CPSO#:
41332
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Mar 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Silva-Ruete, Enrique Gerardo (used until: 24 Mar 1999 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: University of Bahia, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:02 Dec 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Sep 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2003 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 07 Jun 2003 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 07 Mar 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Aug 2009 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 May 2003
Summary:
On May 26, 2003, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Silva-Ruette to have committed and act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct with respect to his care of a female patient.
The Committee ordered the following penalty:
1) that Dr. Silva-Ruette be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register,
2) that Dr. Silva-Ruette(s certificate of registration be suspended for 9 months commencing June 23, 2003,
3) that a limitation be placed on Dr. Silva-Ruette(s certificate of registration that he will not conduct physical examinations of female patients,
4) that Dr. Silva-Ruette will obtain written acknowledgements from patients of their awareness of the condition/limitation on his certificate of registration and will keep the acknowledgement in the patient record,
5) that the College will have the right to attend at Dr. Silva-Ruette(s office on a random basis once per year to conduct a chart pull to ensure that Dr. Silva-Ruette has obtained the aforementioned written acknowledgements,
6) that Dr. Silva-Ruette will complete the College(s boundary course within the next 12 months,
7) that Dr. Silva-Ruette will pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00 prior to the end of the inspection; and
8) that Dr. Silva-Ruette has agreed to post a letter of credit in the amount of $10,000.00 to guarantee the payment of funding provided to the patient under the programming specified in section 85.7 of the Code.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 26, 2003
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: August 27, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Enrique Gerardo Silva Ruette to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
I, Dr. Enrique G. Silva Ruette:
1).Hereby resign from the College, effective immediately.
2). Undertake never to apply or re-apply for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
3). Consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.
4). Acknowledge that, in exchange for this Undertaking, the College agrees not to proceed with a discipline referral of allegations, as set out in the Notice of Hearing dated August 6, 2008, that I engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. In particular, it is alleged that I failed to maintain proper boundaries in my relationship with a female patient for whom I provided psychiatric care.
5). Agree that, in the event that the College should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and shall have the right to proceed with the investigation and prosecution of the allegations referred to at paragraph 4.