THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 21:00:49 PM
Huang, Shao-Nan
CPSO#:
41028
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Oct 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: National Taiwan University, 1954
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:09 Nov 1964 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:13 Mar 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 1965 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Feb 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 1983 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Oct 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Apr 2023 |