THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:56:29 PM
Magner, Peter O'Connell
CPSO#:
33852
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division Of Nephrology
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82512
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Nephrology |
Effective:11 Sep 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:25 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER O'CONNELL MAGNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGNER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Dec 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Sep 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1993 |