THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:01:18 PM
Bragg, Paul Rupert George
CPSO#:
33839
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 15 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:14 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Sep 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |