THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 19:55:38 PM
Ho, Victoria Yin Wan
CPSO#:
33836
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
564 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5N6
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Victoria Ho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 22 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:07 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Apr 2023 |