THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:39:42 AM
Grof, Paul
CPSO#:
33809
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Mar 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Nov 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English
Education: Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2023 |