THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 9:31:18 AM
Maranda, Claude Ronald
CPSO#:
33768
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Oct 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:23 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1971 to 30 Jun 1972
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1972 to 30 Jun 1973
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Sep 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Apr 2023 |