THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:47:29 PM
Hirte, Holger Wolfgang
CPSO#:
33754
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: H. W. Hirte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:05 Sep 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 16 Jun 1981
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jun 2023 |