THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 13:48:35 PM
Herd, Stuart William
CPSO#:
33749
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Feb 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Feb 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy Middlesex Gen. Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
395 Carrie St
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Phone: (519) 245-1550
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Four Counties Health Services |
Newbury |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:21 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STUART WILLIAM HERD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1980 to 14 Jun 1981
PostGrad Yr 1 - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2007 |