THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:10:23 PM
Haq, Rashida
CPSO#:
33732
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Punjab University India, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond St
St. Michael's Health Unity Toronto
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rashida Haq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 27 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:04 Sep 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RASHIDA HAQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAQ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 1982 |