THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:23:59 AM
Ho-Tai, Paul
CPSO#:
33726
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Sep 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Paul Ho-Tai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:To any paitent looking for a copy of their medical records please contact the medical records department at the hospital or healthcare facility where your diagnostic imaging study was performed.
Date Received: 04 Jan 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:25 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jan 2019 |