THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 6:36:59 AM
Galley, Peter William
CPSO#:
33721
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Oct 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Peter Galley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 25 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 1982 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2006 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Oct 2017 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: October 1, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Galley signed an undertaking agreeing to resign from the College effective October 1, 2017, and not to apply or re-apply to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)