THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:01:11 PM
Mederski, Barbara Donna
CPSO#:
33720
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Polish, Spanish
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bridgepoint Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BARBARA DONNA MEDERSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEDERSKI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 1982 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2023 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Mar 1991
Summary:
In March 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Mederski guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that she engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Mederski be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that she be fined $5000.00.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 28 Mar 1991