THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:26:39 PM
Chan, John Yiu Chow
CPSO#:
33716
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
05 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Sep 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:6 Cedarbank Crescent
Don Mills, ON M3B 3A4
Date Received: 05 Aug 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:05 Sep 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2014 |