THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:17:25 PM
Samulska, Hanna Maria
CPSO#:
33704
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Oct 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Dec 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 1994 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jun 2007 |